Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Bing, Harmon, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY - FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SRS REOPEN EVENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHE=MENT Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED WELLS FARGO BANK, ON 07/31/17 AT 12:19 PM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COS 8/11/17 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT FEE Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED mdlabarbera@aol Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.