Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Caplinger, Randy E, King'S Mill Townhomes Owners' Assn Inc, State Of Fla. Depart. Of Revenue, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: January 26, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL STEPHANIE R CAPLINGER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.