Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gmac Mortgage Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Seay, Jennifer M, Brompton Place Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barton, M. James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarton, M. James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ W/CHECK No. 707747. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.