Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of America Nac O President, Vp, Flagship Community Bank, Frym, Michel R, Frym, Catherine M, Bay Port Colony Property Owners Assn Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION JOINT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIG. NOTE MAILED TO: RONALD R. WOLFE P.O. BOX 25018 TAMPA, FL 33633 PER ORDER SIGNED BY R.C.P. 4/18/13 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL RETN OF ORIG DOCS, PLEASE DELIVER FILE TO CHERYL WAGNER, TX Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS & SUBS. PHOTOSTATIC COPIES Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.