Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cardwell, Anita, Cardwell, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Waste Management Inc Of Florida, Bell, Willie E, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePendino, D. Sam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107 | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL 12/20/10 SDP. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TERA D WILHELM ESQUIRE REGARDING PLEADINGS FILED. USER ID=WARRENB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.