Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Michael S, Young, Connie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Rottstedt, Jon K, Rottstedt, Karla V, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Um Carrier, Metlife Auto And Home Insurance Company, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ 01/10/11 RAF JR. USER ID=STMARIAM Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C176 - LETTER TO. JUDGE HONEYWELL FROM ROLANDO G. GUERRA, JR,. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE. USER ID=STMARIAM Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY W/PREJ. USER ID=STMARIAM Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.