Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Fire And Casualty Companyc O Chief Financial Officer, Ra, Tucciarone, Vito, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Zumbana, Hector M, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArnold, D. James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430.. USER ID=DAVISKIM
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT IN FAVOR OF PLTF. 3/8/06 GPH. USER ID=MAHER Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COSTS AND INTEREST. USER ID=DAVISJO Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE RYAN S. BURKE, ESQ.. USER ID=DAVISJO Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=DAVISJO Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LEE ANN MITCHELL. USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT CERTIFIED MAIL. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.