Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Figueruelo, Elizabeth Simon, Figueruelo, Felix R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Monroe, Marilyn, Monroe, Homer, First Liberty Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430.. USER ID=DAVISKIM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE HEIDI L. WHITE. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING W/PREJ 04/13/06 CEH. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE GRISEL RODRIGUEZ. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.