Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mclendon, Calina, Cannon, Voncille Lynn, Hillsborough Kids, Inc, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Hillsborough Kids Inc, Florida Department Of Children And Families, The Children'S Home Community Based Care, Inc.,, Goodson, Beverly, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO 3RD PARTY DEFT, THE CHILDREN'S HOME COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC. USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER GRANTING 3RD PARTY DEFT, THE CHILDREN'S HOME COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT CLOSING CASE 07/18/06 CEH. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT 07/18/06 CEH. USER ID=GRAHAMMA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.