Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lastinger, Isabella Ann, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Walters, Raven Uriah, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Scott, Monique. M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott, Monique. M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;314;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/A283E86E-3C41-4867-B7Fa-17204Ab06Bf6/Results/1F5Ebcbd-0Cb4-4203-8A97-00E54Acb31A5/Lines/34E18A04-647F-49C8-884E-8819A1B6B8E3/Disposition_Html |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL TIZ-AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL TIZ-AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
SHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION - SIGNED 10/07/2022 |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL TIZ-AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL TIZ-AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL ACK-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.