Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jaramillo, Yolanda, filed a(n) Civil case against Sanchez, Karina, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1813;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/58763327-5De6-4003-8752-24Fdcf9B98Ed/Results/7Da1932F-16Ab-43Fb-8E81-8Fb6D8Ead8C7/Lines/9Ecc9405-760F-4Ec3-A72D-275619210A64/Disposition_Html |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: October 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: September 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 21, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM
Date: October 12, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.