Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chacon, Cindy, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Souders , Bradley David, against Imperial Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Gutman, Jack. N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGutman, Jack. N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1818;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/33D6913B-6Fda-402E-A3B2-8F752A825010/Results/E732E8C0-55C9-437B-B111-9Aa9F1330270/Lines/33F4A03D-Fab9-4801-87B8-36Ec3931B29B/Disposition_Html |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 24, 2021Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: September 23, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 09/27/2021 |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.