Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Questa Nova, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Mcmillan , John Edward, against Thompkins, Sawana N., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Chandler, Cory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChandler, Cory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1782;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/406456A6-C373-4190-8907-49E8Ed9Fd202/Results/0D1Fc1E5-4886-4940-Ae4A-D2E96684D3Ba/Lines/E0Aec8A9-C71F-4D70-9Ece-6211A0E3Eaa9/Disposition_Html |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY
Date: October 05, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: September 23, 2021E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS SENT TO ACCOUNTING |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT TICKET | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 1/26/2022 @ 9:30 AM |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISBURSING DEFENDANT'S REGISTRY DEPOSIT, JANUARY 26, 2022 @ 9:30 AM |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.