Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Civil case against Rodriguez, Heriberto, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Moody, James. S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, James. S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;2254;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/673C415E-0898-4099-Bbb3-Ed5722Cf69F8/Results/Ddfa9Efc-562C-4Ac5-9C02-3F4Aa9F702Ea/Lines/Dc37Cfdd-Cf3C-4B59-9679-37D148Eadbd0/Disposition_Html |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: October 05, 2021E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: November 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HERIBERTO RODRIGUEZ 10/2/21 |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.