Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Foster, Elizabeth, Rose Radiology Centers, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Lamoureux , Jason Frederick, against Government Employees Insurance Company, represented by Dimarco-Stanitski, Angelica Frances, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Schultz-Kin, Leslie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchultz-Kin, Leslie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1818;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/6A607A6B-Ec47-46B2-B834-612Cf2Ffa03D/Results/Ce481893-Ad97-427C-Ad7F-Cc5908Bcc9A3/Lines/839B8Da9-0E96-49F8-8745-Ce5Fb71Ecd34/Disposition_Html |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 19, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 07, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHAUSTION OF PIP BENEFITS - AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.