Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Eikner , Claudia R, against Brown, James R, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Schultz-Kin, Leslie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchultz-Kin, Leslie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1805;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/9238A35B-24F6-4Dae-8828-9D55C5F913Ea/Results/2Fb19148-B502-4E22-B8Ad-7B1F24Aa41C3/Lines/66428Ba5-7F4A-4C78-Bbec-92C0Ba291512/Disposition_Html |
CERTIFICATE OF
Date: October 28, 2022MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 28, 2022REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER OF MEDIATION AND CONFERENCE SET
Date: December 10, 2021JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION
Date: December 10, 2021E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Date: July 07, 2021COURT TICKET
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 29, 2021CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE
Date: December 06, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: July 01, 2021DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 01, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: November 17, 2021CLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF PLTF ATTY |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY JUDICIAL AGAINST JAMES R. BROWN |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420 | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLTF AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MEDIATION AND CONFERENCE SET | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION 1/18/22 @ 10:30 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.