Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gleason, Gregory, filed a(n) Civil case against Dax, Michael V, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Costello, Jessica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCostello, Jessica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
COURT TICKET
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 18, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | ||
March 18, 2021 | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | ||
March 15, 2021 |
COURT TICKET AT PRETRIAL |
||
March 15, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 03/15/2021 2 PM |
||
March 11, 2021 | JOINT STIPULATION | ||
February 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | ||
February 19, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
February 04, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED SUMMONS, STATEMENT OF CLAIM, COVER SHEET |
||
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Judge: Costello, Jessica |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Judge: Costello, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.