Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mondejar, Omarys, Presgar Imaging Of Cmi South, L.C., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Friedman , Philip Alan, against Infinity Auto Insurance Company, A Foreign Corporation, represented by Glenn , Rebecca Ann, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Allen, Lisa. A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen, Lisa. A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 20, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
December 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | ||
March 18, 2021 |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY TO DEFT |
||
March 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | ||
March 04, 2021 | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | ||
March 04, 2021 |
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT |
||
February 19, 2021 | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | ||
February 18, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
||
February 18, 2021 | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME | ||
January 26, 2021 | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.