Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fraga Perez, Amarily, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Reynolds , Robert Anthony, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Meyer , Louis Paul, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Battles, Emmett. L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, Emmett. L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Amarily Fraga Perez against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of Hillsborough County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $30,000. The plaintiff alleges that they had an insuran...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: September 20, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH ORDER | ||
March 10, 2022 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
February 07, 2022 |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CITIZENS' DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
||
February 03, 2022 | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
February 02, 2022 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
December 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE | ||
November 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE | ||
October 28, 2021 | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | ||
October 28, 2021 | REPLY | ||
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: Battles, Emmett. L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.