Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Magnified Group Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Mckinney, George Allen, Jr, Mckinney, John David, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 20, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT | ||
March 22, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | ||
March 17, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | ||
March 10, 2021 |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK DUE TO PROOF OF PUBLICATION SERVED TIME NOT EXPIRED (30 DAYS PUBLISHED ON 2/5/2021) |
||
March 08, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | ||
February 26, 2021 | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | ||
February 17, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | ||
February 15, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | ||
February 02, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM | ||
February 01, 2021 |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.