Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Synovus Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Mckenzie, Tyrone D, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Tibbals, Wesley. D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTibbals, Wesley. D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Synovus Bank against Tyrone D. McKenzie. The plaintiff is a Georgia corporation and the defendant is subject to jurisdiction and can be served at an address in Tennessee. The complaint states that on December 27, 2012, the ...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT | ||
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - kharris@tokn Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) EAST Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
File Home Location - Electronic
Judge: Tibbals, Wesley. D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.