Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Travieso, Isamar, Travieso, Ismar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Giddings , Brian Matthew, against Acme Barricades, L.C., Lane, Anthony John, represented by Logan , Michael Denham, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Moody, James. S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, James. S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint document appears to be a filing in the Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit. However, the provided text does not contain any specific information about the complaint itself, such as the parties involved, the nature of the dispute,...
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED
Date: March 25, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED DUCES TECUM DEPONENT JAY PAREKH, D.O. |
||
March 25, 2022 | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | ||
March 21, 2022 |
NOTICE OF EXAMINATION (COMPULSORY MEDICAL) |
||
March 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | ||
March 18, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | ||
March 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NON-PARTY LIMITED |
||
March 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | ||
March 11, 2022 | REQUEST FOR COPIES | ||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | ||
March 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.