Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Scoppettuolo, Neal, Summitwood Works, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc., a foreign corporation doing business as JGA Beacon, against Summitwood Works, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, and Neal Scoppettuolo. The complaint alleges that Summitwood Works exec...
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED
Date: August 30, 2019E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 30, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED GARNISHEE - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA Brianleung@holcomblaw Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT GARNISHEE - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT GARNISHEE - T D BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.