Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
D'Anastasio, Joshua filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT DETAIL CALENDAR REPORT DATED 2-5-15 |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ADMINISTRATIVE FILE OPENED "This file has been created pursuant to Administrative Order S-2006-146 (signed September 22, 2006) which directs the Clerk of the Circuit Court to open an Administrative File and thereafter to open a new Clerk's administrative file on the first busi |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.