Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against C1 Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Northlakes Civic Association Inc, Oakley, Amanda Leigh, Tutunick, Brian, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: April 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION TO: ANY HEIRS, DEVISEES. GRANTEES ALL PERSONS CLAIMING INTEREST Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION (FILING #18144306) Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO AMANDA LEIGH OAKLEY @ 2415 S. TUTTLE AVE. SARASOTA FL 34239 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH BY PUBLICATION Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY RESIDENCE OF AMANDA LEIGH OAKLEY Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY PUBLISHED IN: BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY BY ATTORNEY: AMANDA LEIGH OAKLEY Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.