Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garcia, Laura Vanessa, The Florida Department Of Reve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Castro, Melissa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, dismissed 9/16/2022 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 8/2/22 WARRANT SERVED 8/5/22 | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for REOPEN CASE/CIVIL OTHER on 8/5/2022 | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CASE | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CSUP scheduled on 8/5/2022 at 0825 AM, VC - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT / DRD | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN CLOSED | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event CSUP on 8/5/2022 0825 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 8/5/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.