Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Griffith, Jennifer Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Griffith, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts with BARBEE, DON JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBARBEE, DON JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISS MARRIAGE | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED SETTING FINAL HEARING ON 08/13/2021 AT 8:30 A.M. | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPP GUIDELINE WORKSHEET | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - WIFE | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/FINAL HEARING ON 07/06/21 AT 3:30 PM | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE - WIFE | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE - HUSBAND | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SCHEDULG MEETING W/SELF - 2/23/2021 @ 11 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.