Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Barney, Krystell Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Delprete, Krystell Marie, in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts with EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF LEGAL NAME CHANGE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF EMAIL CONFIRMATION VITAL STATISTICS | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT-NAME CHANGE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCUMENTS FILED - -REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GEN MAG | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM 05/03/2021 AT 11:00 AM | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance MISC has been created with due date of 7/6/2021 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 272021DR000035DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/8/2021 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.