Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Cronin, Dennis, Cuffe, Joyce, Joyce, John Michael, filed a(n) Other Civil: Other Circuit Civil case represented by Plante, David Joseph, against Nordman, Mark C, represented by Johnson, Stephen Hunter, in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts with ANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil: Other Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by John Michael Joyce, Dennis Cronin, and Joyce Cuffe against Mark C. Nordman in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Hernando County, Florida. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The jurisdi...
NOTICE OF - SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (PLNTFS)
Date: December 21, 2017SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO ON DAVE BOUTHILETTE 091318
Date: September 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLNTF DENNIS CRONIN | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 082119 OF JOHN MICHAEL JOYCE AT 1:00, DENNIS CRONIN AT 2:00 AND JOYCE CUFF AT 3:00 | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | JOHN MICHAEL JOYCE dismissed 8/14/2019 | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO - PLNTF, JOHN MICHAEL JOYCE W/O PREJ | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED TO RESPOND TO DEFS MTN TO COMPEL PLNTFS DEPOS - PLNTFS SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFS MTN AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 080919 | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED W/O PREJ DTD 081219 | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 082119 OF JHN MICHAEL JOYCE AT 1:00; DENNIS CRONIN AT 2:00 AND JOYCE CUFF AT 3:00 | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PLNTFS DEPOS FILED BY DEF | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY STEPHEN HUNTER JOHNSON ESQ IB NAT 3M 2019 THROUGH JUNE 17, 2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.