Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brookridge Community Property, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Deciucies, Angelo, Florida Homes, Kesterke, Edward, Daly Aluminum Products Inc, Ridge, Point Homes Inc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2011 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | RECORDED DOC RETURNED FROM REC - OR BK 2933 PG 913-915 | |
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT - GRANTED DTD 082912 | |
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | COURT WORKSHEET - PLAINTIFF NEEDS TO HAVE COMMUNITY VOTE ON AGE LIMITS IN BROOKRIDGE GRANTED | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event | PLNTFS AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DALY ALUMINUM PRODUCTS INC | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | BROOKRIDGE INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.