Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carr, Ross D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carr, Kristin Lavelle, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DOM CASES FILED | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000216 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW ACTIONS FILED | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 262021DR000013DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/6/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.