Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Myers Dor, Donshay R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diamond, Tavarius D, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: TAVARIUS D DIAMOND (RET TO ATTY) | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Unserved TAVARIUS D DIAMOND | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Cover Sheet | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TAVARIUS D DIAMOND (RET TO ATTY) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER FILED | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 3/30/2022 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER FILED AND RECORDED | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT PROCEEDING FILED | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.