Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Guardado, Concepcion, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gayosso Ortiz, Mario, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MNGMT COMPLIANCE REPORT | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HR on 8/17/2023 0130 PM Judge ROBERT OSTROV results Cancelled on 8/17/2023 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 12/7/2023 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 8/17/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.