Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Barfield, James E, Barfield, James Fred, Barfield, Mary Alice, Barfield, Thomas W, Howard Fertilizer And Chemical, (total of 6) See All represented by Alvaro, Chad Keflin, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with James D. Sloan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames D. Sloan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Commercial $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (RECORDED)
Date: September 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (RECORDED) | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event FS on 4/25/2018 1100 AM Judge JAMES SLOAN results Cancelled on 4/6/2018 | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATED SETTMENT | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL EXPENSE | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.