Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cruz, Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Duarte, Leonel, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAIDEN, MICHAEL E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED CORRECTED DOCUMENTS AND PAY HISTORIES TO RACHEL AT DOR VIA EMAIL | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED DOCUMENTS REQUESTED TO RACHEL AT DOR VIA EMAIL | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST FILED BY DOR/CSE TO DISREGARD THE AMOUNT OF $5643.96 AND JUST ADJUST AND CREDIT THE ORIGINAL TERM | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF CHILD SUPPORT TERMS AND WORKSHEETS FOR CREDITING $3048.96 PER ORDER | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST FILED BY DOR/CSE TO UPDATE DRD PER ATTACHED FINAL ORDER CREDITING PAYMENTS AND WRITTEN DECLARATION | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FAX COPY FROM DOR/CSP TO CREDIT ACCOUNT | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF FINAL ORDER CREDITING PAYMENTS WITH ATTACHED WRITTEN DECLARATION OF DIRECT PAYMENTS | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; SINGED BY JUDGE 09032021; GRANTED PETITION TO AUTHORIZE CHILD SUPPORT CREDIT DISMISSED | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.