Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goodman, James Jefferson Jr. filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Material Transfer Inc, Steve Brants Roofing Inc, Haughty Heron, Parker Sanitation Ii Inc, North Florida Ice Vending Llc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - NORTH FL. ICE VENDING, LLC | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SATISFACTION AND DISMISSAL, Haughty Heron | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SATISFACTION AND DISMISSAL, Gulf Coast Timber Co. | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SATISFACTION AND DISMISSAL, Dr. Ivers | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - PARKER SANITATION II, INC. | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL - STEVE BRANTS ROOFING, INC | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - BAREFOOT COTTAGES, BIEL REO, LLC | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - HAUGHTY HERON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.