Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, Charles, Edwards, Wendy, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Kelley, Danielle Joyner, against Green Tree Insurance Agency In, Green Tree Servicing Llc, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN LEWIS II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN LEWIS II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 08, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS - (E FILED) | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL - (E FILED) | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - GREEN TREE INSURANCE AGENCY, INC C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM - (E FILED) - Prosposed / Executed | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM - (E FILED) - Proposed / Executed | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $39.00 Receipt Number MX 2015001609 | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $39.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $39.00 | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $39.00 Receipt Number MX 2015001569 | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $39.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.