Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Maul, Leroy Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harper, Lillian Marie, Harper- Maul, Lilian Marie, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | RCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- FORWARD TO (RECORDING) - HAND DELIVERED TO PETITIONER & RESPONDENT CERTIFIED COPIES | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- BOOK # 384; PAGE # 1025 | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR CA scheduled on 7/18/2022 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge JACK LUNDY presiding. | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: LUNDY , JACK E assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.