Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bearden, Timi Cherie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno, Sabrina, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR CA scheduled on 8/22/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge JACK LUNDY presiding. | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING-AUGUST 22, 2023 AT 1:30PM | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING - DR CA on 7/26/2023 1000 AM Judge JACK LUNDY results CONTINUE on 7/26/2023 | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.