Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harvey, James R., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 51940 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 222022CP000037CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/21/2022 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.