Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Braswell, Janie Kay filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (SINGLE)- STANLO JEFFREY JOHNS | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (SINGLE)- TODD CHRISTOPHER JOHNS | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 51929 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 222022CP000036CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2022 | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.