Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Matrix Financial Services Corp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Diaz, Roy Alan, against Flagstar Bank, Fsb, Lewis, Dennis M, Lewis, Jessica Sarah, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, (total of 5) See All represented by Diaz, Roy Alan, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY HENRY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY HENRY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 29, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- PENDING PAYMENT FOR (RECORDING)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT
Date: June 29, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 29, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: DENNIS M. LEWIS- SENT THRU EPORTAL (ATTY)
Date: August 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA LEWIS- SENT THRU EPORTAL (ATTY)
Date: August 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: DENNIS M. LEWIS
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1- SENT THRU EPORTAL (ATTY)
Date: August 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA LEWIS
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2- SENT THRU EPORTAL (ATTY)
Date: August 05, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DENNIS M. LEWIS
Date: August 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1
Date: August 19, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:
Date: September 14, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2022ORDER OF RECUSAL- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: September 16, 2022ORDER OF RECUSAL
Date: October 06, 2022Receipt Copy
Date: September 15, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- BOOK # 387; PAGE #229
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: October 06, 2022ORDER OF RECUSAL
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Service
Date: December 28, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- BOOK # 387; PAGE # 856
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: October 25, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: October 28, 2022VERIFIED NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Date: October 28, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 28, 2022VERIFIED NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- BOOK # 389; PAGE # 402
Date: December 19, 2022ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: December 06, 2022ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING- JANUARY 11, 2023 AT 9 AM ( ZOOM)
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: November 11, 2022Stipulation
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: December 22, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:
Date: December 27, 2022ANSWER- THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 11, 2023PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO VARIOUS FILINGS OF DEFENDANTS DENNIS LEWIS AND JESSICA LEWIS
Date: January 25, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 26, 2023REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY- INSPECTION OF AUTHENTIC INSTRUMENT
Date: March 02, 2023PETITION MOTION- REMUNERATION SUBMITTED IN HONOR- UNDER PROTEST
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 15, 2023 AT 9:30 AM
Date: February 03, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT- CAUSE FOR RELIEF SUBMITTED IN HONOR- UNDER PROTEST
Date: March 27, 2023ANSWER OBJECTIONS MOVING FORWARD UNDER PROTEST
Date: February 13, 2023PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 16, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO (SECOND) REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Date: April 03, 2023ANSWER- REPLY TO MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: April 10, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2023Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due
Date: April 12, 2023PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DENNIS LEWIS
Date: April 12, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: April 12, 2023PETITION FOR THIRD PARTY INTERVENTION- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: April 13, 2023SPECIAL REQUEST FOR ASSISTANCE- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: April 13, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 17, 2023ORDER
Date: April 20, 2023PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO JESSICA LEWIS
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING-MAY 24, 2023 AT 9:30 AM (ZOOM HEARING)
Date: April 25, 2023EMERGENCY MOTION PETITION FOR THIRD PARTY INTERVENTION- 4TH REQUEST
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING- WEDNESDAY, MAY 24, 2023 @ 9:30 AM
Date: May 22, 2023notice of limited appearance
Date: May 24, 2023notice of limited appearance- exb. 2
Date: May 24, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 02, 2023PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 02, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING-ZOOM
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY- FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY
Date: June 26, 2023MOTION- RELEASE AND DISCHARGE
Date: June 27, 2023MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 27, 2023OTHER- COURT MINUTES
Date: June 28, 2023SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT(RECORDING)
Date: June 29, 2023ORDER OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE
Date: July 07, 2023ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Date: June 29, 2023SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE- BOOK#394; PAGE#1021
Date: July 06, 2023MOTION
Date: October 04, 2023Order to Cancel Sale
Date: October 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: August 29, 2022Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: UNKNOWN TENANT NO.1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2
Date: August 29, 2022COMPLAINT/ RESPONSE: DENNIS MATTHEW LEWIS
Date: August 30, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES/ QUESTIONS
Date: August 30, 2022COMPLAINT/ RESPONSE: DENNIS MATTHEW LEWIS- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: August 30, 2022Affidavit of Attorney's Fee
Date: September 14, 2022Affidavit of Non-military Service
Date: September 14, 2022Receipt Copy
Date: August 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Cancel Sale | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE- BOOK#394; PAGE#1021 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT(RECORDING) | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGEMENT | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER- COURT MINUTES | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION- RELEASE AND DISCHARGE | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY- FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.