Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Selene Finance Lp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case against Beck, Kathleen K, United States Of America, Unknown Spouse Of Kathleen K B, represented by Kyle, Kevin John, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED- US OF AMERICA SECRETARY OF HOUSING
Date: March 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE
Date: March 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - KATHLEEN BECK
Date: March 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST RECEIVED FROM FINANCE | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST SENT TO FINANCE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS- PROPOSED | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED- BOOK #393; PAGE#697 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title - Proposed | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING - DR CA on 5/15/2023 1000 AM Judge JACK LUNDY results CANCELLED on 5/1/2023 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.