Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gutierrez, Joao A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Perez, Antonio Rafael, against Barahona, Maria, Tenants, Unknown, Unknown Spouse Of Maria Baraho, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 02, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event FORECLOSURE SALE on 8/4/2022 1100 AM Judge JACK LUNDY results DISPOSED on 6/2/2022 | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO CLERK AND LETTER TO GCSO | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: MARIA BARAHONA AND UNKNOWN TENANTS- HAND DELIVERED TO GCSO TO BE SERVED | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED= BOOK # 386: PAGE #177 | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE- BOOK #386; PAGE #176 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipt Copy | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | BIDDER SIGN IN SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.