Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Pennymac Loan Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kasper, Kathryn Ishee, against Gomez, Doicelina, Gomez, Pedro, Possession 1, Unknown Party In, Possession 2, Unknown Party In, Wjh, Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 31, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: October 31, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (WAITING ON RECORDING FEES)
Date: October 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REJECTION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED (SENT TO RECORDING) | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS ISSUED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDING RECIEPT | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE WITH PUBLICATION | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 43610 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.