Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anderson, Brittany Nichole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anderson, Sterlin, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PRO SE HEARING DISPOSITION FORM FROM HEARING HELD 2-28-23 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 2-28-23 AT 10:00 AM | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/28/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUB SERVED TO REGINALD GRAHAM III, CO RESIDENT, DUVAL COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE, 1-11-23 | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Groeb , Robert K assigned | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 212023DR000007DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/5/2023 | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | APPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.