Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Department Of Revenue,, Wyllie, Shelby, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Reyes, Johnny, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW CASE HISTORY SHEET(S) | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES / support no longer owed | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW CASE HISTORY SHEET(S) | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RELATED CASE #21-2021-DR-095 FJ OF PATERNITY **support closed zero balance in #21-2022-dr-0227*** ***support esbt in #21-2021-dr-095**** jm | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FL RULE 2.516 ATTORNEY PAMELA SCHNEIDER / DOR | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 212022DR000227DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2022 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET/ DOR | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.