Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Munson, Daniel J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Munson, Tracy Lavon, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PRO SE HEARING DISPOSTION FORM FROM HEARING HELD 12-12-23 | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | APPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS FOR TRACY MUNSON | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE-TRACY MUNSON | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR TRACY MUNSON | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING TO 12-12-23 AT 4PM. | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event NONJURY TRIAL on 10/24/2023 0400 PM Judge Robert Groeb results CANCELLED on 10/18/2023 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/12/2023 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.