Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Perry, Cheryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perry, Travis, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Robert K. Groeb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert K. Groeb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 2-27-24 AT 2:30 PM. | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/27/2024 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION AT ISSUE | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF DEFAULT SIGNED BY THE CLERK | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Financial Affidavit FOR CHERYL PERRY | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURES | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PARENTING COURSE COMPLETION | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.