Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Donna F, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Callaway, Lawrence C, against Barbara L Monrose, The Unknown, Gilchrist County,Florida, Cler, Highnote, John H, Joseph N Grosser, The Unknown, Paz, Jose, (total of 10) See All represented by Mckoy, Douglas Kent, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY/ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FOR JOHN H HIGHNOTE-LL | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO STEVEN L PAZ | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM,GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AS LITEM | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY/ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF ACTION | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT (THE UNKN HEIR OF JOHN H HIGHNOTE (BARBARA L MONROSE)-ISSUED BY CLERK | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT (THE UNKN HEIR OF JOHN H HIGHNOTE (BARBARA L MONROSE) | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JOHN H HIGHNOTE (JOSEPH GROSSER) ON 9/30/22 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE UNKN HEIR OF JOHN H HIGHNOTE (BARBARA L MONROSE) ON 10/1/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.